RI H5029 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a classified employee, whose position is not fully funded through federal loans and/or grants to seek the nomination of or to be a candidate for elective state office.
Title
Merit System
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2019) |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5029.pdf |