RI H5025 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides copies of public records at no cost to state legislators acting in their official capacity and in the furtherance of legislative business or oversight.
Title
Access To Public Records
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Millea [D] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2019) |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/23/2019) |
2019-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5025.pdf |