RI H5025 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/16/2017)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/16/2017)
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an economic hardship relief fund from penalties imposed on contractors for past due road or bridge projects to be paid to business owners who can show a decline in revenue as a result of the past due completion of a road or bridge project.
Title
Department Of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/16/2017) |
2017-05-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5025.pdf |