RI H5024 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the exemption for retirement income from state income tax from $15,000 to $30,000 commencing in 2018.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Robert Lancia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5024.pdf |