RI H5020 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]


Appropriates nine hundred thousand dollars ($900,000) for elderly and disabled bus pass assistance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Elderly And Disabled Bus Pass Assistance



2017-05-09HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-05-05HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017)
2017-01-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance


Rhode Island State Sources

Bill Comments