RI H5016 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the real and tangible personal property of The Providence Community Health Centers, a Rhode Island domestic nonprofit corporation, located in Providence, Rhode Island, on the list of properties exempt from taxation.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation -- Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/18/2021) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2021-05-11 | House | House read and passed |
2021-05-07 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/11/2021) |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-04-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/06/2021) |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |