RI H5015 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Domestic Relations - Persons Eligible To Marry (marriage Equality)
Title
An Act Relating To Domestic Relations - Persons Eligible To Marry (marriage Equality)
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Gordon Fox [D] | Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] |
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-05-02 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2013-04-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/02/2013) |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B in concurrence |
2013-04-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2013) |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/24/2013) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/23/2013) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-24 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-01-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (01/24/2013) |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-01-22 | House | Substitute A |
2013-01-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (01/22/2013) |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-01-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/15/2013) |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |