RI H5014 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-12 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-12 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for the licensing of surgical assistants to assist doctors in performing surgeries.
Title
Certified Surgical First Assistants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2023-06-12 | House | House passed Sub A |
2023-06-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/12/2023) |
2023-06-06 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-06-02 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-06-02 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2023) |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2023) |
2023-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |