RI H5013 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the authorization for physical therapists to order diagnostic imaging as an authorized practice of physical therapy until December 31, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical Therapists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-09 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-12HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-06HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-06SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2023-06-02SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/06/2023)
2023-06-01SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2023-05-26SenateScheduled for consideration (06/01/2023)
2023-05-15SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2023-05-09HouseHouse read and passed
2023-05-05HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/09/2023)
2023-05-04HouseCommittee recommends passage
2023-04-28HouseScheduled for consideration (05/04/2023)
2023-02-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-02-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2023)
2023-01-06HouseIntroduced, referred to House Health & Human Services

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback