RI H5009 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-06 - Referred to Senate Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"Pupil Transportation Vehicle" to be and constructed to seat not more than ten (10) passengers including the operator, rather than the existing limit of eight (8) passengers.
Title
Pupil Transportation Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2023-05-18 | House | House read and passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/18/2023) |
2023-05-11 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-05-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2023) |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2023) |
2023-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |