RI H5007 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2019 And 2020 (this Resolution Would Amend The House Rules By Removing The Consent Requirements Of The Majority And Minority Leaders For Suspension Of A Rule.)
Title
House Resolution Amending The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2019 And 2020 (this Resolution Would Amend The House Rules By Removing The Consent Requirements Of The Majority And Minority Leaders For Suspension Of A Rule.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-01-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2021) |
2021-01-14 | House | Committee heard and continued |
2021-01-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing (01/14/2021) |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Rules Committee |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5007.pdf |