PA SR78 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-05-01 - Transmitted as directed
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-05-01 - Transmitted as directed
Summary
A Resolution designating April 24, 2007, as "Pennsylvania's Day of Remembrance of the Armenian Genocide of 1915-1923."
Title
A Resolution designating April 24, 2007, as "Pennsylvania's Day of Remembrance of the Armenian Genocide of 1915-1923."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-05-01 | Transmitted as directed | |
2007-04-23 | Adopted | |
2007-04-17 | Reported as committed | |
2007-04-02 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=R&bn=78 |