PA SR5 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-16 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: House Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution establishing the Task Force on Women Veterans' Health Care.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution establishing the Task Force on Women Veterans' Health Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2017-11-14 | House | In the House |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |