PA SR421 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on October 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-23 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to pass the language from the Hemp Farming Act of 2018, as contained in the 2018 Farm Bill, removing industrial hemp from the Schedule I Controlled Substance List and legalizing commercial industrial hemp production in the United States, and urging the Department of Agriculture of the Commonwealth to conduct a study of industrial hemp research pilot programs and prepare recommended draft statutory and regulatory language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the Congress of the United States to pass the language from the Hemp Farming Act of 2018, as contained in the 2018 Farm Bill, removing industrial hemp from the Schedule I Controlled Substance List and legalizing commercial industrial hemp production in the United States, and urging the Department of Agriculture of the Commonwealth to conduct a study of industrial hemp research pilot programs and prepare recommended draft statutory and regulatory language.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-23SenateTransmitted as directed
2018-10-15SenateAdopted
2018-10-02SenateReported as committed
2018-09-25SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback