PA SR421 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on October 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-23 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on October 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-23 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to pass the language from the Hemp Farming Act of 2018, as contained in the 2018 Farm Bill, removing industrial hemp from the Schedule I Controlled Substance List and legalizing commercial industrial hemp production in the United States, and urging the Department of Agriculture of the Commonwealth to conduct a study of industrial hemp research pilot programs and prepare recommended draft statutory and regulatory language.
Title
Urging the Congress of the United States to pass the language from the Hemp Farming Act of 2018, as contained in the 2018 Farm Bill, removing industrial hemp from the Schedule I Controlled Substance List and legalizing commercial industrial hemp production in the United States, and urging the Department of Agriculture of the Commonwealth to conduct a study of industrial hemp research pilot programs and prepare recommended draft statutory and regulatory language.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-23 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |