PA SR419 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-16)
Status: Passed on October 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-09 - Adopted (191-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution honoring the life of Stephen C. MacNett.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Concurrent Resolution honoring the life of Stephen C. MacNett.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-09 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Floor: SR 419 PN 1996, CONCUR (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 419 PN 1996 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-09HouseAdopted (191-0)
2018-10-09HouseReported as committed
2018-09-26HouseReferred to RULES
2018-09-25HouseIn the House
2018-09-25SenateAdopted (49-0)
2018-09-24SenateReported as committed
2018-09-24SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=R&bn=419
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=R&billNbr=0419&pn=1996
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1058
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=642
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1512
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2046

Bill Comments

feedback