PA SR398 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Passed on October 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-8)
Status: Passed on October 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution designating the month of October 2020 as "Domestic Violence Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Designating the month of October 2020 as "Domestic Violence Awareness Month" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-14 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-10-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |