PA SR36 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to reauthorize the Rohrabacher-Farr amendment to prevent the United States Department of Justice from spending funds to interfere with the implementation of state medical marijuana laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging the Congress of the United States to reauthorize the Rohrabacher-Farr amendment to prevent the United States Department of Justice from spending funds to interfere with the implementation of state medical marijuana laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 36 PN 552 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateTransmitted as directed
2017-03-27SenateAdopted (47-2)
2017-03-21SenateReported as amended
2017-03-16SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback