PA SR34 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study and issue a report relating to the long-term sustainability and viability of the Pennsylvania State System of Higher Education.
Title
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study and issue a report relating to the long-term sustainability and viability of the Pennsylvania State System of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 34 PN 624 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Adopted (50-0) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |