PA SR33 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution establishing a task force on lead exposure and the hazards of lead poisoning; imposing duties on the Joint State Government Commission; and authorizing a study.
Title
Establishing a task force on lead exposure and the hazards of lead poisoning; imposing duties on the Joint State Government Commission; and authorizing a study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 33 PN 749 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Adopted (49-0) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |