PA SR322 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study standardized tests in public education.
Title
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to study standardized tests in public education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |