PA SR288 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct a study of long-term care facilities' impact relating to Medicaid funds in this Commonwealth.
Title
Directing the Joint State Government Commission to conduct a study of long-term care facilities' impact relating to Medicaid funds in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 288 PN 1629 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Adopted (50-0) |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |