PA SR260 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Adopted (177-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution extending the due date for a report of a special bipartisan, bicameral legislative commission on improving the delivery of emergency services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Concurrent Resolution extending the due date for a report of a special bipartisan, bicameral legislative commission on improving the delivery of emergency services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - House Floor: SR 260 PN 1440 (Y: 177 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 260 PN 1440, CONCURRENT RESOLUTION (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAdopted (177-0)
2018-05-02HouseReported as committed
2018-04-18HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2018-04-16HouseIn the House
2018-04-16SenateAdopted (50-0)
2018-03-20SenateReported as committed
2018-01-29SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=R&bn=260
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=R&billNbr=0260&pn=1440
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=03/20/2018&RollCallId=710
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=448
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/02/2018&RollCallId=1524
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1260

Bill Comments

feedback