PA SR195 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-15 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the Congress of the United States to oppose the proposal to make an unnecessary and harmful change to Internal Revenue Service reporting requirements that affect financial institutions and their customers in this Commonwealth.
Title
Urging the Congress of the United States to oppose the proposal to make an unnecessary and harmful change to Internal Revenue Service reporting requirements that affect financial institutions and their customers in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 195 PN 1162 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 195 PN 1162, 2021 A28850, PHILLIPS-HILL Amendment No. A-2885 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 195 PN 1162, 2021 A28850, PHILLIPS-HILL Amendment No. A-2885 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Adopted (29-20) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Amended (29-20) |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |