PA SR144 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution establishing the 2030 Commission on Education and Economic Competitiveness.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution establishing the 2030 Commission on Education and Economic Competitiveness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 144 PN 926 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2021-06-23 | House | In the House |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Adopted (50-0) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |