PA SB995 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the capital budget for the fiscal year 2018-2019.
Title
Providing for the capital budget for the fiscal year 2018-2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |