PA SB99 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1990 (P.L.1200, No.202), known as the Solicitation of Funds for Charitable Purposes Act, providing for the regulation of collection receptacles and disclosure requirements; and further providing for criminal penalties.
Title
Providing for the regulation of collection receptacles and disclosure requirements; and further providing for criminal penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] | Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-10-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |