PA SB976 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on November 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-03 - Act No. 111
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on November 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-03 - Act No. 111
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in jurisdiction of appellate courts, providing for commerce court program; and, in organization and jurisdiction of courts of common pleas, further providing for problem-solving courts and providing for commerce courts.
Title
In jurisdiction of appellate courts, providing for commerce court program; and, in organization and jurisdiction of courts of common pleas, further providing for problem-solving courts and providing for commerce courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 976 PN 2023, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 976 PN 2023, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06831 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 976 PN 1481, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 976 PN 1481, A5557, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-5557 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 976 PN 2023, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: SB 976 PN 2023, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06831 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 976 PN 1481, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 976 PN 1481, A5557, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-5557 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 111 |
2020-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-10-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-10-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-10-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-10-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-10-20 | House | Second consideration |
2020-09-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-09-29 | House | First consideration |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-05-13 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-05-12 | House | In the House |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |