PA SB976 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for definitions, for exceptions to prohibition of interception and disclosure of communications and for exceptions to prohibitions in possession, sale, distribution, manufacture or advertisement of electronic, mechanical or other devices; and providing for recordings by law enforcement officers.
Title
In wiretapping and electronic surveillance, further providing for definitions, for exceptions to prohibition of interception and disclosure of communications and for exceptions to prohibitions in possession, sale, distribution, manufacture or advertisement of electronic, mechanical or other devices; and providing for recordings by law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 976 PN 2165, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 976 PN 1372, A10646, GREENLEAF AMENDMENT NO. A-10646 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 976 PN 1372, A10646, GREENLEAF AMENDMENT NO. A-10646 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-20 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-10-19 | House | In the House |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (45-5) |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments (48-1) |
2016-10-17 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-08-13 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |