PA SB969 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-08 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 24, 1998 (P.L.882, No.111), known as the Crime Victims Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in crime victims, further providing for responsibilities of department, local correctional facilities and board; in administration, further providing for office and for powers and duties of victim advocate and providing for confidentiality of records; and, in financial matters, further providing for costs for offender supervision programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; in crime victims, further providing for responsibilities of department, local correctional facilities and board; in administration, further providing for office and for powers and duties of victim advocate and providing for confidentiality of records; and, in financial matters, further providing for costs for offender supervision programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 969 PN 1463, A4789, PITTMAN AMENDMENT NO. A-4789 (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-08SenateRemoved from table
2020-09-08SenateLaid on the table
2020-09-08SenateAmended on third consideration (26-24)
2020-06-10SenateRemoved from table
2020-06-10SenateLaid on the table
2020-04-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-02-03SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-02-03SenateSecond consideration
2020-01-29SenateFirst consideration
2020-01-29SenateReported as committed
2020-01-24SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=969
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0969&pn=1463
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0969&pn=1939
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=01/29/2020&RollCallId=726
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/21/2020&RollCallId=809
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=615

Bill Comments

feedback