PA SB967 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
Pending: House Children & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
Pending: House Children & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Women, Infants and Children State Advisory Board.
Title
Establishing the Women, Infants and Children State Advisory Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 967 PN 1771, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |
2022-06-15 | House | In the House |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-12-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-12-10 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |