PA SB961 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for learner's permits and for driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked; in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offenses of homicide by vehicle, aggravated assault by vehicle, homicide by vehicle while driving under influence, aggravated assault by vehicle while driving under the influence, for accidents involving death or personal injury while not properly licensed and for accidents involving certain vehicles; and, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for grading and for penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licensing of drivers, further providing for learner's permits and for driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked; in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for the offenses of homicide by vehicle, aggravated assault by vehicle, homicide by vehicle while driving under influence, aggravated assault by vehicle while driving under the influence, for accidents involving death or personal injury while not properly licensed and for accidents involving certain vehicles; and, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for grading and for penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-15 - House - House Floor: SB 961 PN 2087, 2017 A10110, MARSICO (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A09947 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 961 PN 1585, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 961 PN 1585, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-15HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-10-11HouseRemoved from table
2018-10-09HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-09HouseFirst consideration
2018-10-09HouseReported as amended
2018-04-19HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-04-18HouseIn the House
2018-04-18SenateFinal passage (45-4)
2018-04-18SenateVote on final passage reconsidered
2018-04-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-2)
2018-04-17SenateSecond consideration
2018-03-26SenateAmended on second consideration
2018-03-19SenateRemoved from table
2018-03-19SenateLaid on the table
2017-12-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-12-13SenateReported as amended
2017-11-15SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=961
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0961&pn=1337
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0961&pn=1390
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0961&pn=1585
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0961&pn=2087
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0961&pn=2098
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=12/13/2017&RollCallId=597
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=468
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2019
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=10/09/2018&RollCallId=2020
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1553

Bill Comments

feedback