PA SB945 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for contributions to Veterans' Trust Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In registration of vehicles, further providing for contributions to Veterans' Trust Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 945 PN 1718, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-06-19HouseIn the House
2018-06-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-05-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-21SenateSecond consideration
2018-04-25SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-25SenateReported as amended
2017-11-01SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=945
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0945&pn=1312
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0945&pn=1718
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=04/25/2018&RollCallId=818
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=979
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=564

Bill Comments

feedback