PA SB945 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for contributions to Veterans' Trust Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In registration of vehicles, further providing for contributions to Veterans' Trust Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-11 - House - House Floor: SB 945 PN 1718, FP (Y: 177 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 945 PN 1718, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-24HouseAct No. 149
2018-10-24HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-10-15HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-15HouseSigned in House
2018-10-12HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (177-0)
2018-10-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-10HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-10HouseSecond consideration
2018-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-24HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-24HouseFirst consideration
2018-09-24HouseReported as committed
2018-06-21HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-06-19HouseIn the House
2018-06-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-05-21SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-21SenateSecond consideration
2018-04-25SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-25SenateReported as amended
2017-11-01SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=945
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0945&pn=1312
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0945&pn=1718
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=04/25/2018&RollCallId=818
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=979
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=564
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1913
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1542
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/11/2018&RollCallId=2059

Bill Comments

feedback