PA SB940 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on October 21 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for filing and recording by municipalities of condemnation orders and for statements of vacated condemnation orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for filing and recording by municipalities of condemnation orders and for statements of vacated condemnation orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 940 PN 1951, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - House - House Floor: SB 940 PN 1951, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07202 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 940 PN 1766, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-21SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-10-20SenateSigned in House
2020-10-20SenateSigned in Senate
2020-10-20SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (48-0)
2020-10-20SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-10-20SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2020-10-19SenateIn the Senate
2020-10-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-10-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-09-30HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-30HouseSecond consideration
2020-09-29HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-17HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-17HouseReported as amended
2020-07-22HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS
2020-07-14HouseIn the House
2020-07-14SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-06-30SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-10SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-09SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-09SenateReported as amended
2019-11-18SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=940
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0940&pn=1385
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0940&pn=1766
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0940&pn=1951
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=35&theDate=06/09/2020&RollCallId=941
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/30/2020&RollCallId=1047
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=598
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2459
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=09/17/2020&RollCallId=2460
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1667
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=684
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=10/20/2020&RollCallId=1240

Bill Comments

feedback