PA SB936 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in support matters generally, further providing for attachment of income.
Title
In support matters generally, further providing for attachment of income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 936 PN 1148, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 936 PN 1148, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 936 PN 1148, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 936 PN 1148, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Act No. 64 |
2016-07-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-22 | House | Signed in House |
2016-06-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-1) |
2016-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-14 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-01-19 | House | In the House |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-11-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |