PA SB934 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry, its departmental administrative and advisory boards and departmental administrative officers, further providing for fees and for Industrial Board and establishing the Elevator Safety Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry, its departmental administrative and advisory boards and departmental administrative officers, further providing for fees and for Industrial Board and establishing the Elevator Safety Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 934 PN 1826, 2017 A7756, EVANKOVICH (Y: 43 N: 153 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-06-18 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 934 PN 1826, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-20HouseSecond consideration
2018-06-19HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-18HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-18HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-18HouseReported as committed
2018-06-15HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2018-06-13HouseIn the House
2018-06-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-13SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-06SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-06SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-05SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-05SenateReported as amended
2017-10-31SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=934
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0934&pn=1300
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0934&pn=1826
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=898
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=558
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=960
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=1681
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1365

Bill Comments

feedback