PA SB934 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry, its departmental administrative and advisory boards and departmental administrative officers, further providing for fees and for Industrial Board and establishing the Elevator Safety Board.
Title
In powers and duties of the Department of Labor and Industry, its departmental administrative and advisory boards and departmental administrative officers, further providing for fees and for Industrial Board and establishing the Elevator Safety Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 934 PN 1826, FP (Y: 173 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 934 PN 1826, 2017 A7756, EVANKOVICH (Y: 43 N: 153 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-06-18 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 934 PN 1826, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: SB 934 PN 1826, FP (Y: 173 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Floor: SB 934 PN 1826, 2017 A7756, EVANKOVICH (Y: 43 N: 153 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-06-18 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 934 PN 1826, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-28 | House | Act No. 68 |
2018-06-28 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | Signed in House |
2018-06-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (173-22) |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-20 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-06-15 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2018-06-13 | House | In the House |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |