PA SB932 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-07 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-07 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in educational tax credits, further providing for definitions.
Title
In educational tax credits, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Michael Regan [R] | Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] |
Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: SB 932 PN 1197, 2021 A4330 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: SB 932 PN 1197, 2021 A4329 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: SB 932 PN 1197, 2021 A4328 (Y: 91 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-23 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 932 PN 1197, Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: SB 932 PN 1197, 2021 A4329 (Y: 89 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-06-07 - House - House Floor: SB 932 PN 1197, 2021 A4328 (Y: 91 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-23 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 932 PN 1197, Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-12-15 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2021-12-14 | House | In the House |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (33-16) |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-11-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |