PA SB927 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in military educational programs, further providing for medical officer or health officer incentive program, for definitions, for establishment of program, for program stipend, for additional incentives, for recoupment of incentive payments and for adjustment of stipend amounts.
Title
In military educational programs, further providing for medical officer or health officer incentive program, for definitions, for establishment of program, for program stipend, for additional incentives, for recoupment of incentive payments and for adjustment of stipend amounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. John Kane [D] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04479 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 927 PN 1220, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02902 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04479 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 927 PN 1220, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02902 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2022-01-26 | House | In the House |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-11-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |