PA SB927 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in licensing of drivers, further providing for issuance and content of driver's license.
Title
In licensing of drivers, further providing for issuance and content of driver's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 927 PN 1320, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 927 PN 1320, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: SB 927 PN 1320, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 927 PN 1320, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | House | Act No. 74 |
2020-07-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-07-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-07-08 | House | Signed in House |
2020-07-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-07-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-07 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-24 | House | Removed from table |
2020-06-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2020-06-09 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2020-06-08 | House | In the House |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-10-25 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |