PA SB919 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 28, 1937 (P.L.955, No.265), referred to as the Housing Authorities Law, further providing for powers of an authority; and providing for relocation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for powers of an authority; and providing for relocation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 919 PN 1549, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-19HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-19HouseReported as committed
2018-03-26HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS
2018-03-21HouseIn the House
2018-03-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2018-03-20SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-03-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-03-19SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-01-22SenateRemoved from table
2018-01-22SenateLaid on the table
2017-10-18SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-18SenateReported as amended
2017-10-05SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=919
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0919&pn=1232
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0919&pn=1270
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0919&pn=1549
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=35&theDate=10/18/2017&RollCallId=489
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=03/20/2018&RollCallId=717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=433
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1690
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1692

Bill Comments

feedback