PA SB915 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-28 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, repealing provisions relating to fertilizer; providing for fertilizer; in soil and plant amendment, further providing for disposition of funds; in seed, further providing for disposition of funds; establishing the Agronomic Regulatory Account within the General Fund; imposing duties on the Department of Agriculture; and making conforming amendments.
Title
Repealing provisions relating to fertilizer; providing for fertilizer; in soil and plant amendment, further providing for disposition of funds; in seed, further providing for disposition of funds; establishing the Agronomic Regulatory Account within the General Fund; imposing duties on the Department of Agriculture; and making conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 915 PN 1717, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2020-05-27 | House | In the House |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2020-04-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |