PA SB910 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-07 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, providing for student-weighted basic education funding.
Title
In reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, providing for student-weighted basic education funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |