PA SB909 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-13 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, No.1), known as the Taxpayer Relief Act, in taxation by school districts, further providing for definitions, for adoption of preliminary budget proposals, for information to school districts, for property tax limits on reassessment and for public referendum requirements for increasing certain taxes.
Title
In taxation by school districts, further providing for definitions, for adoption of preliminary budget proposals, for information to school districts, for property tax limits on reassessment and for public referendum requirements for increasing certain taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |