PA SB906 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 125
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 3 (Agriculture) and 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the definitions of "agricultural biosecurity area" and for "posted notice"; and further providing for keeping and handling of domestic animals, for ecoterrorism and for criminal trespass.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the definitions of "agricultural biosecurity area" and for "posted notice"; and further providing for keeping and handling of domestic animals, for ecoterrorism and for criminal trespass.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-11-15 - House - SB 906 PN 2121, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-28 - Senate - SB 906 PN 2121, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-11-23 Act No. 125
2010-11-23 Approved by the Governor
2010-11-22 Presented to the Governor
2010-11-22 Signed in House
2010-11-17 Signed in Senate
2010-11-15 Third consideration and final passage
2010-10-06 Second consideration
2010-10-04 Re-reported as committed
2010-09-29 Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2010-09-29 Removed from table
2010-09-29 Laid on the table
2010-09-29 First consideration
2010-09-29 Reported as committed
2010-09-28 Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2010-09-28 In the House
2010-09-28 Third consideration and final passage
2010-09-22 Re-reported as committed
2010-09-21 Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2010-09-21 Second consideration
2010-09-20 Removed from table
2010-07-03 Laid on the table
2010-06-30 First consideration
2010-06-30 Reported as amended
2009-06-05 Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback