PA SB905 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the capital budget for fiscal year 2019-2020; itemizing public improvement projects, furniture and equipment projects, transportation assistance, redevelopment assistance projects, flood control projects, Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission projects and Manufacturing Fund projects leased or assisted by the Department of General Services and other State agencies, together with their estimated financial costs; authorizing the incurring of debt without the approval of the electors for the purpose of financing the projects to be constructed, acquired or assisted by the Department of General Services and other State agencies; authorizing the use of current revenue for the purpose of financing the projects to be constructed, acquired or assisted of by the Department of General Services and other State agencies stating the estimated useful life of the projects; restricting use of funds on certain projects; and making appropriations and a repeal of a redevelopment assistance project in a prior act itemizing capital projects.
Title
Providing for the capital budget for fiscal year 2019-2020; itemizing public improvement projects, furniture and equipment projects, transportation assistance, redevelopment assistance projects, flood control projects, Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission projects and Manufacturing Fund projects leased or assisted by the Department of General Services and other State agencies, together with their estimated financial costs; authorizing the incurring of debt without the approval of the electors for the purpose of financing the projects to be constructed, acquired or assisted by the Department of General Services and other State agencies; authorizing the use of current revenue for the purpose of financing the projects to be constructed, acquired or assisted of by the Department of General Services and other State agencies stating the estimated useful life of the projects; restricting use of funds on certain projects; and making appropriations and a repeal of a redevelopment assistance project in a prior act itemizing capital projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House Floor: SB 905 PN 1754, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 905 PN 1754, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: SB 905 PN 1430, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Constitutionality A04323 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04175 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04315 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03898 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 905 PN 1336, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 905 PN 1754, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: SB 905 PN 1430, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Constitutionality A04323 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04175 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04315 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A03898 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 905 PN 1336, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Act No. 36 |
2020-07-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-06-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-06-10 | House | Signed in House |
2020-06-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (199-3) |
2020-06-10 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-06-09 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-06-08 | House | In the House |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (50-0) |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2019-12-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2019-12-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-1) |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-21 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-10-31 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-30 | House | In the House |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |