PA SB9 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Act No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the Eastern hellbender (Cryptobranchus alleganiensis alleganiensis) as the official amphibian of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the Eastern hellbender (Cryptobranchus alleganiensis alleganiensis) as the official amphibian of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Floor: SB 9 PN 43, FP (Y: 191 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 9 PN 43, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23HouseAct No. 3
2019-04-23HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-04-23HousePresented to the Governor
2019-04-17HouseSigned in House
2019-04-23HouseSigned in Senate
2019-04-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-6)
2019-04-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-15HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-15HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-19HouseReported as committed
2019-02-05HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2019-02-04HouseIn the House
2019-02-04SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-1)
2019-01-30SenateSecond consideration
2019-01-29SenateFirst consideration
2019-01-29SenateReported as committed
2019-01-23SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=9
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0009&pn=0043
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=01/29/2019&RollCallId=3
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=8
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=02/06/2019&RollCallId=23
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=196
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/16/2019&RollCallId=287

Bill Comments

feedback