PA SB9 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring identification of lawful presence in the United States as a prerequisite to the receipt of public benefits.
Title
Requiring identification of lawful presence in the United States as a prerequisite to the receipt of public benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A07914 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00288 (Y: 1 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00224 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00223 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00286 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A07914 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 9 PN 241, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00288 (Y: 1 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00224 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00223 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00286 (Y: 0 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A07914 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 9 PN 241, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-07-10 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-02-24 | House | In the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (40-8) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |