PA SB9 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act requiring identification of lawful presence in the United States as a prerequisite to the receipt of public benefits.
Title
Requiring identification of lawful presence in the United States as a prerequisite to the receipt of public benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - SB 9 PN 356, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-14 | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented | |
2009-04-03 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2009-04-01 | In the House | |
2009-04-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-31 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-30 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-25 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-24 | First consideration | |
2009-03-24 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |